Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note April 12, 2022
Fiscal Note March 22, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 21, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022