Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00118 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/22/2022

                     
Researcher: JKL 	Page 1 	3/22/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 118  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE USE OF CERTAIN POLYSTYRENE 
PRODUCTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires certain schools to phase out the use of expanded 
polystyrene trays by July 1, 2024. It applies to school districts; regional 
school districts; regional vocational technical schools; and the 
constituent units of higher education, which include UConn (all 
campuses) and the Connecticut State Colleges and Universities (four 
state universities, 12 community colleges, and Charter Oak State 
College) (CGS § 10a-1). 
The bill also prohibits restaurants and catering businesses from 
providing or distributing single-use expanded polystyrene food and 
beverage containers to customers, beginning July 1, 2024. But its 
provisions do not (1) preempt a more restrictive municipal ordinance or 
(2) prohibit manufacturing or selling single-use expanded polystyrene 
containers in the state by an entity that is not a restaurant or caterer. 
Under the bill, “expanded polystyrene” is blown polystyrene and 
expanded and extruded foams that are thermoplastic petrochemical 
materials using a styrene monomer and processed by any number of 
techniques, including fusing polymer spheres and injection, foam, or 
extrusion molding. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage, except the provisions for 
restaurants and catering businesses are effective July 1, 2024. 
EXPANDED POLYSTYRENE TRAYS IN SCHOOLS 
The bill:  
1. requires each school district, regional school district, regional 
vocational technical school, and constituent unit of higher  2022SB-00118-R000066-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 2 	3/22/22 
 
education to develop a plan by July 1, 2023, to discontinue the 
use of expanded polystyrene trays;  
2. calls for the plans to require the districts, schools, and constituent 
units to (a) discontinue use of the trays by July 1, 2024, and (b) 
prepare to end or amend any purchasing contracts for the trays 
by July 1, 2023; and  
3. exempts a district or school that stops using these trays before 
July 1, 2023, from having to develop a plan. 
SINGLE-USE EXPANDED POLYSTYRENE CONTAINERS 
Prohibition 
Beginning July 1, 2024, the bill bans restaurants and caterers from 
providing or distributing single-use expanded polystyrene food and 
beverage containers to customers. It exempts from the ban containers (1) 
filled and sealed before being received by a restaurant or caterer that are 
sold to customers or (2) used by a butcher or store to hold raw meat. 
Under the bill, a “restaurant” is a space in a suitable and permanent 
building that is kept, used, maintained, advertised, and held out to the 
public as a place where meals are regularly sold to the public (CGS § 
19a-342). A “caterer” is a business involved in (1) selling or distributing 
food or drink prepared in bulk in one location for retail service in 
another location or (2) preparing and serving food in a venue that is not 
under the caterer’s control (CGS § 19a-36g). 
Penalties and Enforcement 
The bill requires that the owner or operator of a restaurant or caterer 
that violates the ban receive a warning for a first violation, $200 fine for 
a second violation, $500 fine for a third violation, and $1,000 fine for a 
subsequent violation. A restaurant or caterer may only be issued one 
violation per day. 
Under the bill, a local health department or health district, or the 
departments of Public Health (DPH), Consumer Protection (DCP), or 
the Energy and Environmental Protection (DEEP), may enforce the ban. 
If a local health department or health district enforces it, then half of the  2022SB-00118-R000066-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 3 	3/22/22 
 
imposed fine goes to the municipality where the violation occurred.  
Required Report 
By February 1, 2025, the DPH, DCP, and DEEP commissioners must 
jointly submit a report to the Public Health, General Law, and 
Environment committees on the law’s enforcement and the need to 
establish a hardship waiver for any restaurant or caterer with a 
demonstrated financial hardship directly caused by the law. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 21 Nay 10 (03/04/2022)