Senate | 03/29/2022 | File Number 186 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 157 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |