Senate | 05/19/2023 | File Number 793 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 531 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8097 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | File Number 527 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Calendar Number 323 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Vote to Draft |