Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023