LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06462
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06462
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06462
Action History
House
03/20/2023
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
House
03/17/2023
Drafted by Committee
House
02/28/2023
Vote to Draft
House
02/17/2023
Public Hearing 02/23
House
02/02/2023
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing