Senate | 05/26/2023 | File Number 831 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 566 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8492 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | File Number 534 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Calendar Number 329 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |