Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06738 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note May 26, 2023
Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 26, 2023
Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023