Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
File Number 776
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 494
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7582
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
File Number 667
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House Calendar Number 451
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|