Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023