House | 04/12/2023 | File Number 539 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | House Calendar Number 334 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |