Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06840 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 17, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 12, 2023