Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
File Number 786
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 513
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7673
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7208
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
File Number 336
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
House Calendar Number 235
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|