Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023