LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06873
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06873
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06873
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 18, 2023
Bill
March 6, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 12, 2023
Analysis
May 8, 2023
Analysis
May 5, 2023
Bill
April 18, 2023
Compare
Analysis
April 18, 2023
Chaptered
Bill
June 12, 2023
Compare