House | 05/24/2023 | File Number 814 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | House Calendar Number 572 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/23/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Public Hearing 05/08 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |