Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Public Act 23-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7769
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
File Number 228
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Calendar Number 151
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|