Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01103 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 2, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 5, 2023