LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01158
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01158
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2023 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01158
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 6, 2023
Bill
February 28, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
August 4, 2023
Analysis
May 17, 2023
Bill
April 6, 2023
Compare
Analysis
April 6, 2023
Chaptered
Bill
May 19, 2023
Compare