Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Public Act 24-52
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
House Calendar Number 463
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
File Number 523
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 299
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|