Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 18, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Analysis April 17, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2024