House | 05/02/2025 | House Calendar Number 527 | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7666 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7141 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | File Number 388 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 239 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |