Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 1, 2025
Bill March 5, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2025
Bill April 1, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025