Senate | 04/28/2025 | File Number 779 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 412 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/25 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |