Council | 05/05/2023 | Law L25-0002, Effective from Apr 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006320, Expires on Nov 30, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/03/2023 | Act A25-0013 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002648 | ||
Council | 02/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/23/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0013 | ||
Council | 02/15/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/27/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0018 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 01/13/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |