District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0018 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/07/2023

                             
 ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit 
Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the tipped 
minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to M	ay 1, 2023. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023". 
 
Sec. 2. S ection 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective March 
25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9-	248; D.C. Official Code § 32-	1003(f)(3)), is amended by striking the 
phrase “January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “Ma y 1, 2023” in its place. 
 
Sec. 3. The Tipped Minim um Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023, effective January 26, 2023 (	D.C. Act 25- 3; 70 DCR 1628), is repealed.  
 
Sec. 4. Applicability.  
This act shall apply as of the effective date of the District of Columbia Tip Credit 
Elimination Act of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	700; D.C. Official Code § 
32-1003).  
 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 6. Effective date. 
 (a)  This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by   
 ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
2 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-	day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-	206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register. 
 (b)  This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia