10 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | ____________ |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | ______________________ |
---|
17 | | - | |
---|
18 | | - | |
---|
19 | | - | To amend, on a temporary basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit |
---|
20 | | - | Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the tipped |
---|
21 | | - | minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to M ay 1, 2023. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification |
---|
25 | | - | Temporary Amendment Act of 2023". |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. S ection 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective March |
---|
28 | | - | 25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9- 248; D.C. Official Code § 32- 1003(f)(3)), is amended by striking the |
---|
29 | | - | phrase “January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “Ma y 1, 2023” in its place. |
---|
30 | | - | |
---|
31 | | - | Sec. 3. The Tipped Minim um Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Emergency |
---|
32 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023, effective January 26, 2023 ( D.C. Act 25- 3; 70 DCR 1628), is repealed. |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 4. Applicability. |
---|
35 | | - | This act shall apply as of the effective date of the District of Columbia Tip Credit |
---|
36 | | - | Elimination Act of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 700; D.C. Official Code § |
---|
37 | | - | 32-1003). |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
39 | | - | Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
40 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal |
---|
41 | | - | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, |
---|
42 | | - | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | Sec. 6. Effective date. |
---|
45 | | - | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 10 | + | A BILL 1 |
---|
| 11 | + | 2 |
---|
| 12 | + | 25-18 3 |
---|
| 13 | + | 4 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 15 | + | 6 |
---|
| 16 | + | ______________________ 7 |
---|
| 17 | + | 8 |
---|
| 18 | + | 9 |
---|
| 19 | + | To amend, on a temporary basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit 10 |
---|
| 20 | + | Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the tipped 11 |
---|
| 21 | + | minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to M ay 1, 2023. 12 |
---|
| 22 | + | 13 |
---|
| 23 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 14 |
---|
| 24 | + | act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification 15 |
---|
| 25 | + | Temporary Amendment Act of 2023". 16 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. S ection 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective March 17 |
---|
| 27 | + | 25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9- 248; D.C. Official Code § 32- 1003(f)(3)), is amended by striking the 18 |
---|
| 28 | + | phrase “January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “Ma y 1, 2023” in its place. 19 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 3. The Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Emergency 20 |
---|
| 30 | + | Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on January 17, 2022 (Bill 25- ___), is 21 |
---|
| 31 | + | repealed. 22 |
---|
| 32 | + | 23 |
---|
| 33 | + | 24 |
---|
| 34 | + | 25 |
---|
| 35 | + | ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|
54 | | - | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30- day period of congressional review |
---|
55 | | - | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December |
---|
56 | | - | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of |
---|
57 | | - | Columbia Register. |
---|
58 | | - | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. |
---|
59 | | - | |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Chairman |
---|
64 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
71 | | - | Mayor |
---|
72 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
| 43 | + | Sec. 4. Applicability. 26 |
---|
| 44 | + | This act shall apply as of the effective date of the District of Columbia Tip Credit 27 |
---|
| 45 | + | Elimination Act of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24- 700; D.C. Official Code § 28 |
---|
| 46 | + | 32-1003). 29 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 30 |
---|
| 48 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 31 |
---|
| 49 | + | impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 32 |
---|
| 50 | + | approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 33 |
---|
| 51 | + | Sec. 6. Effective date. 34 |
---|
| 52 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 35 |
---|
| 53 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30- day period of congressional review 36 |
---|
| 54 | + | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 37 |
---|
| 55 | + | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1- 206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 38 |
---|
| 56 | + | Columbia Register. 39 |
---|
| 57 | + | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 40 |
---|