Council | 06/16/2023 | Law L25-0008, Effective from May 25, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 008447, Expires on Jan 05, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/13/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/31/2023 | Act A25-0063 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 003838 | ||
Council | 03/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0063 | ||
Council | 03/15/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 02/21/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0100 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 02/06/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |