District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0100 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022 to provide that 
an applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 
Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 
and was selected by the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board on September 28, 2022 shall 
be allowed to change the locati	on of its cultivation center or retailer facility on its 
application by September 30,2023, without otherwise affecting the current status of its 
application.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”	. 
 
Sec. 2.  Section 3(g) of the Medical  Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on 
January 30, 2023 (D.C. Act 24-	798; 70 DCR 1582), amending section 7 of the Legalization of 
Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-
315; D.C. Official Code § 7-	1671.06) , is amended as follows: 
(a) Amendatory subsection (v)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “act.”.	” and inserting 
the phrase “act .” in its place.  
(b) A new subsection (w) is added to read as follows:  
“(w) An applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to 
the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, 	and March 28, 2022, and was selected by the ABC 
Board on September 28, 2022 shall be allowed to 	change the location of the cultivation center or 
retailer (formerly, dispensary) facility on its application by September 30, 2023 without 
negatively affecting the current status of the application.”. 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30	-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December  
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 
Columbia register.  
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia