8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | ____________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | __________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022 to provide that |
---|
18 | | - | an applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to the |
---|
19 | | - | Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, |
---|
20 | | - | and was selected by the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board on September 28, 2022 shall |
---|
21 | | - | be allowed to change the locati on of its cultivation center or retailer facility on its |
---|
22 | | - | application by September 30,2023, without otherwise affecting the current status of its |
---|
23 | | - | application. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
26 | | - | act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023” . |
---|
27 | | - | |
---|
28 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 3(g) of the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on |
---|
29 | | - | January 30, 2023 (D.C. Act 24- 798; 70 DCR 1582), amending section 7 of the Legalization of |
---|
30 | | - | Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13- |
---|
31 | | - | 315; D.C. Official Code § 7- 1671.06) , is amended as follows: |
---|
32 | | - | (a) Amendatory subsection (v)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “act.”. ” and inserting |
---|
33 | | - | the phrase “act .” in its place. |
---|
34 | | - | (b) A new subsection (w) is added to read as follows: |
---|
35 | | - | “(w) An applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to |
---|
36 | | - | the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, and was selected by the ABC |
---|
37 | | - | Board on September 28, 2022 shall be allowed to change the location of the cultivation center or |
---|
38 | | - | retailer (formerly, dispensary) facility on its application by September 30, 2023 without |
---|
39 | | - | negatively affecting the current status of the application.”. |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
42 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
43 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
44 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 8 | + | A BILL 1 |
---|
| 9 | + | 2 |
---|
| 10 | + | 25-100 3 |
---|
| 11 | + | 4 |
---|
| 12 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 13 | + | 6 |
---|
| 14 | + | __________________ 7 |
---|
| 15 | + | 8 |
---|
| 16 | + | 9 |
---|
| 17 | + | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022 to provide that 10 |
---|
| 18 | + | an applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 11 |
---|
| 19 | + | Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 12 |
---|
| 20 | + | and was selected by the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board on September 28, 2022 shall 13 |
---|
| 21 | + | be allowed to change the locati on of its cultivation center or retailer facility on its 14 |
---|
| 22 | + | application by September 30,2023, without otherwise affecting the current status of its 15 |
---|
| 23 | + | application. 16 |
---|
| 24 | + | 17 |
---|
| 25 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 18 |
---|
| 26 | + | act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023” . 19 |
---|
| 27 | + | Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 20 |
---|
| 28 | + | 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13- 315; D.C. Official Code § 7- 1671.06) , as 21 |
---|
| 29 | + | amended by section 3(g) of the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on January 22 |
---|
| 30 | + | 30, 2023 (D.C. Act 24- 798; 70 DCR ___), is amended as follows: 23 |
---|
| 31 | + | (a) Amendatory subsection (v)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “Act.”.” and 24 |
---|
| 32 | + | inserting the phrase “Act.” in its place. 25 |
---|
| 33 | + | (b) A new subsection (w) is added to read as follows: 26 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|
53 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
54 | | - | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by |
---|
55 | | - | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30 -day period of congressional review |
---|
56 | | - | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December |
---|
57 | | - | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of |
---|
58 | | - | Columbia register. |
---|
59 | | - | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Chairman |
---|
65 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Mayor |
---|
73 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
74 | | - | |
---|
75 | | - | |
---|
76 | | - | |
---|
| 40 | + | “(w) An applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration 27 |
---|
| 41 | + | application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, and was 28 |
---|
| 42 | + | selected by the ABC Board on September 28, 2022 shall be allowed to change the location of the 29 |
---|
| 43 | + | cultivation center or retailer (formerly, dispensary) facility on its application by September 30, 30 |
---|
| 44 | + | 2023 without negatively affecting the current status of the application.”. 31 |
---|
| 45 | + | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 32 |
---|
| 46 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 |
---|
| 47 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 |
---|
| 48 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 35 |
---|
| 49 | + | Sec. 4. Effective date. 36 |
---|
| 50 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 37 |
---|
| 51 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30 -day period of congressional review 38 |
---|
| 52 | + | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 39 |
---|
| 53 | + | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 40 |
---|
| 54 | + | Columbia register. 41 |
---|
| 55 | + | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 42 |
---|