District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0100 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2023

                       
 
 
 
1 
 
 1 
______________________________                         _____________________________ 2 
Chairman Phil Mendelson                        Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_______ 8 
 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
__________________ 13 
 14 
 15 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022 to provide that 16 
an applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 17 
Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 18 
and was selected by the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board on September 28, 2022 shall 19 
be allowed to change the location of its cultivation center or retailer facility on its 20 
application by September 30,2023, without otherwise affecting the current status of its 21 
application.  22 
 23 
 24 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 25 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. 26 
 27 
Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 28 
1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), as  29 
amended by section 3(g) of the Medical  Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on January 30 
30, 2023 (D.C. Act 24-798; 70 DCR ___), is amended as follows: 31 
 (a) Amendatory subsection (v)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “Act.”.” and 32 
inserting the phrase “Act.” in its place.  33 
 (b) A new subsection (w) is added to read as follows:  34     
 
 
 
2 
 
 “(w) An applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration 35 
application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, and was 36 
selected by the ABC Board on September 28, 2022 shall be allowed to change the location of the 37 
cultivation center or retailer (formerly, dispensary) facility on its application by September 30, 38 
2023 without negatively affecting the current status of the application.”. 39 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 40 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement Budget Director as the fiscal impact 41 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 42 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).   43 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 44 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 45 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 46 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December  47 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 48 
Columbia register.  49 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 50