ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 1 A BILL 1 2 25-100 3 4 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 6 __________________ 7 8 9 To amend, on a temporary basis, the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022 to provide that 10 an applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 11 Alcoholic Beverage Control Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, 12 and was selected by the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board on September 28, 2022 shall 13 be allowed to change the locati on of its cultivation center or retailer facility on its 14 application by September 30,2023, without otherwise affecting the current status of its 15 application. 16 17 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 18 act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023” . 19 Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 20 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13- 315; D.C. Official Code § 7- 1671.06) , as 21 amended by section 3(g) of the Medical Cannabis Amendment Act of 2022, enacted on January 22 30, 2023 (D.C. Act 24- 798; 70 DCR ___), is amended as follows: 23 (a) Amendatory subsection (v)(2) is amended by striking the phrase “Act.”.” and 24 inserting the phrase “Act.” in its place. 25 (b) A new subsection (w) is added to read as follows: 26 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 2 “(w) An applicant that submitted a medical cannabis facility registration 27 application to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021, and March 28, 2022, and was 28 selected by the ABC Board on September 28, 2022 shall be allowed to change the location of the 29 cultivation center or retailer (formerly, dispensary) facility on its application by September 30, 30 2023 without negatively affecting the current status of the application.”. 31 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 32 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 35 Sec. 4. Effective date. 36 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 37 the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30 -day period of congressional review 38 as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 39 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 40 Columbia register. 41 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 42