Council | 06/30/2023 | Act A25-0136 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009065, Expires on Sep 13, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 06/15/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0136, Expires on Sep 13, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 29, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 05/02/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 04/24/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |