District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0266 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/06/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
__________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, Contract No. GAGA-2022-C-0142 with Maxim Healthcare 
Staffing Services, Inc., and Modification Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 thereto, to provide 
temporary healthcare staffing support to the District of Columbia Public Schools, and to 
authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the 
contract and modifications. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Contract No. GAGA-2022-C-0142 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing 
Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2.  Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the 
requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 
2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. 
GAGA-2022-C-0142 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc., and Modification Nos. 1, 3, 
4, 5, 6, and 7 thereto, to provide temporary healthcare staffing support to District of Columbia 
Public Schools, and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $4,057,912 for the goods 
and services received from June 27, 2022 through September 30, 2022, and authorizes payment 
in the not-to-exceed amount of $12,439,784 for goods and services received and to be received 
during the period from October 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023. 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.   
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia