ENROLLED ORIGINAL 1 AN ACT __________ IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA __________________ To approve, on an emergency basis, Contract No. GAGA-2022-C-0142 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc., and Modification Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 thereto, to provide temporary healthcare staffing support to the District of Columbia Public Schools, and to authorize payment for the goods and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may be cited as the “Contract No. GAGA-2022-C-0142 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”. Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council approves Contract No. GAGA-2022-C-0142 with Maxim Healthcare Staffing Services, Inc., and Modification Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 thereto, to provide temporary healthcare staffing support to District of Columbia Public Schools, and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $4,057,912 for the goods and services received from June 27, 2022 through September 30, 2022, and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $12,439,784 for goods and services received and to be received during the period from October 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023. Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). Sec. 4. Effective date. This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section ENROLLED ORIGINAL 2 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). ______________________________ Chairman Council of the District of Columbia _________________________________ Mayor District of Columbia