Council | 06/27/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/16/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Council | 05/26/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/26/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0291 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/24/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/16/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |