Council | 09/29/2023 | Law L25-0043, Effective from Aug 23, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 012876, Expires on Apr 04, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Act A25-0155 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009685 | ||
Council | 07/12/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0155 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/09/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0304 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/06/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/05/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |