District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0304 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/20/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
___________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative 
of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 
points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application period that occurred 
between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be considered for a manufacturer 
license.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Temporary Amendment 
Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 
1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 
amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows:  
 “(y) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis 
facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 
2022, that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer 
license after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 
25-303); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC 
Board by May 1, 2024.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December  
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 
Columbia register.  
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia