8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | ___________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | __________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative |
---|
18 | | - | of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 |
---|
19 | | - | points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to the |
---|
20 | | - | Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application period that occurred |
---|
21 | | - | between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be considered for a manufacturer |
---|
22 | | - | license. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
25 | | - | act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Temporary Amendment |
---|
26 | | - | Act of 2023”. |
---|
27 | | - | |
---|
28 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of |
---|
29 | | - | 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is |
---|
30 | | - | amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows: |
---|
31 | | - | “(y) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis |
---|
32 | | - | facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, |
---|
33 | | - | 2022, that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer |
---|
34 | | - | license after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency |
---|
35 | | - | Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill |
---|
36 | | - | 25-303); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC |
---|
37 | | - | Board by May 1, 2024.”. |
---|
38 | | - | |
---|
39 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
40 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
41 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
42 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
43 | | - | |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | |
---|
46 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 8 | + | A BILL 1 |
---|
| 9 | + | 2 |
---|
| 10 | + | 25-304 3 |
---|
| 11 | + | 4 |
---|
| 12 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 13 | + | 6 |
---|
| 14 | + | __________________ 7 |
---|
| 15 | + | 8 |
---|
| 16 | + | 9 |
---|
| 17 | + | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative 10 |
---|
| 18 | + | of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 11 |
---|
| 19 | + | points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 12 |
---|
| 20 | + | Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application period that occurred 13 |
---|
| 21 | + | between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022 shall be considered for a manufacturer 14 |
---|
| 22 | + | license. 15 |
---|
| 23 | + | 16 |
---|
| 24 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 17 |
---|
| 25 | + | act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Temporary Amendment 18 |
---|
| 26 | + | Act of 2023”. 19 |
---|
| 27 | + | Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 20 |
---|
| 28 | + | 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 21 |
---|
| 29 | + | amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows: 22 |
---|
| 30 | + | “(y)(1) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis 23 |
---|
| 31 | + | facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 24 |
---|
| 32 | + | 2022, that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer 25 |
---|
| 33 | + | license after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 26 |
---|
| 34 | + | Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 27 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|
53 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
54 | | - | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by |
---|
55 | | - | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review |
---|
56 | | - | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December |
---|
57 | | - | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of |
---|
58 | | - | Columbia register. |
---|
59 | | - | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | |
---|
62 | | - | |
---|
63 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Chairman |
---|
65 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
66 | | - | |
---|
67 | | - | |
---|
68 | | - | |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Mayor |
---|
73 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
74 | | - | |
---|
75 | | - | |
---|
76 | | - | |
---|
| 41 | + | 25-__); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC Board 28 |
---|
| 42 | + | by May 1, 2024. 29 |
---|
| 43 | + | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 30 |
---|
| 44 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 31 |
---|
| 45 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 32 |
---|
| 46 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 33 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 4. Effective date. 34 |
---|
| 48 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 35 |
---|
| 49 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 36 |
---|
| 50 | + | as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 37 |
---|
| 51 | + | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 38 |
---|
| 52 | + | Columbia register. 39 |
---|
| 53 | + | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 40 |
---|