Council | 07/14/2023 | Act A25-0164 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009733, Expires on Oct 08, 2023 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0164, Expires on Oct 08, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/27/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 12, 2023 | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 06/20/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |