District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0326 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/20/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
__________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
____________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Green Building Act of 2006 to clarify the applicability of 
net zero energy requirements to housing projects already funded or in progress prior to 
the applicability of those requirements. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Green Housing Transition Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 3(a)(3)(C) of the Green Building Act of 2006, effective March 8, 2007 
(D.C. Law 16-234; D.C. Official Code § 6-1451.02(a)(3)(C)), is amended to read as follows:  
“(C) Maintain net zero energy compliance; except, that:  
“(1) This subparagraph shall not apply to residential projects 
selected by the District or a District instrumentality for financing or land disposition for the 
purposes of providing rent or income-restricted affordable housing for tenants with designated 
household annual incomes if the District commits such assistance prior to December 31, 2023; 
and 
“(2) Nothing in this subparagraph shall be interpreted to allow 
housing projects to violate any other building energy mandate, including section 2(b) of the 
Clean Energy DC Building Code Amendment Act of 2022, effective September 21, 2022 (D.C. 
Law 24-177; D.C. Official Code § 6-1453.01(b)). 
 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date.  
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia