District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0326 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
61 1
7-
8-AN ACT
9-
10-__________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-____________________
15-
16-
17-To amend, on an emergency basis, the Green Building Act of 2006 to clarify the applicability of
18-net zero energy requirements to housing projects already funded or in progress prior to
19-the applicability of those requirements.
20-
21-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
22-act may be cited as the “Green Housing Transition Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”.
23-
24-Sec. 2. Section 3(a)(3)(C) of the Green Building Act of 2006, effective March 8, 2007
25-(D.C. Law 16-234; D.C. Official Code § 6-1451.02(a)(3)(C)), is amended to read as follows:
26-“(C) Maintain net zero energy compliance; except, that:
27-“(1) This subparagraph shall not apply to residential projects
28-selected by the District or a District instrumentality for financing or land disposition for the
29-purposes of providing rent or income-restricted affordable housing for tenants with designated
30-household annual incomes if the District commits such assistance prior to December 31, 2023;
31-and
32-“(2) Nothing in this subparagraph shall be interpreted to allow
33-housing projects to violate any other building energy mandate, including section 2(b) of the
34-Clean Energy DC Building Code Amendment Act of 2022, effective September 21, 2022 (D.C.
35-Law 24-177; D.C. Official Code § 6-1453.01(b)).
36-
37-Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
38-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
39-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
40-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
41-
42-Sec. 4. Effective date.
43-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
44-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
45-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section ENROLLED ORIGINAL
46-
47-
48-
49-
50-2
51-
52-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
53-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
54-
55-
56-
57-
58-______________________________
59-Chairman
60-Council of the District of Columbia
61-
62-
63-
64-
65-_________________________________
66-Mayor
67-District of Columbia
68-
69-
70-
2+ Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2
3+ 3
4+ 4
5+ 5
6+A BILL 6
7+__________ 7
8+ 8
9+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9
10+____________________ 10
11+ 11
12+To amend, on an emergency basis, the Green Building Act of 2006 to clarify the applicability of 12
13+net zero energy requirements to housing projects already funded or in progress prior to 13
14+the applicability of those requirements. 14
15+ 15
16+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16
17+Act may be cited as the “Green Housing Transition Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 17
18+Sec. 2. Section 3(a)(3)(C) of the Green Building Act of 2006, effective March 8, 2007 18
19+(D.C. Law 16- 234; D.C. Official Code § 6- 1451.02(a)(3)(C)), is amended to read as follows: 19
20+“(C) Maintain net zero energy compliance, provided: 20
21+“(1) This subparagraph shall not apply to residential projects 21
22+selected by the District or a District i nstrumentality for financing or land disposition for the 22
23+purposes of providing r ent or income-restricted affordable housing for tenants with designated 23
24+household annual incomes if the District commits such assistance prior to December 31 , 2023; 24
25+and 25
26+“(2) Nothing in this subparagraph shall be interpreted to allow 26
27+housing projects to violate any other building energy mandate, i ncluding section 2(b) of the 27
28+Clean Energy DC Building Code Amendment Act of 2022, effective September 21, 2022 (D.C. 28
29+Law 24-177; D.C. Official Code § 6- 1453.01). 29
30+Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 30 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 31
31+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 32
32+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). 33
33+Sec. 4. Effective date. 34
34+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 35
35+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 36
36+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 37
37+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 38
38+D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.12(a)). 39