District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0326 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/14/2023

                         1 
   Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
__________ 7 
 8 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 9 
____________________ 10 
 11 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Green Building Act of 2006 to clarify the applicability of 12 
net zero energy requirements to housing projects already funded or in progress prior to 13 
the applicability of those requirements. 14 
 15 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 16 
Act may be cited as the “Green Housing Transition Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 17 
Sec. 2. Section 3(a)(3)(C) of the Green Building Act of 2006, effective March 8, 2007 18 
(D.C. Law 16- 234; D.C. Official Code § 6-	1451.02(a)(3)(C)), is amended to read as follows:  19 
“(C) Maintain net zero energy compliance, provided:  20 
“(1) This subparagraph shall not apply to residential projects 21 
selected by the District or a District i	nstrumentality for financing or land disposition for the 22 
purposes of providing r	ent or income-restricted affordable housing for tenants with designated 23 
household annual incomes if the District commits such assistance prior to December 31	, 2023; 24 
and 25 
“(2) Nothing in this subparagraph shall be interpreted to allow 26 
housing projects to violate any other building energy mandate, i ncluding section 2(b) of the 27 
Clean Energy DC Building Code Amendment Act of 2022, effective September 21, 2022 (D.C. 28 
Law 24-177; D.C. Official Code § 6-	1453.01). 29 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.  30  The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 31 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 32 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 33 
Sec. 4. Effective date.  34 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 35 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 36 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 37 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 38 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 39