Council | 02/16/2024 | Law L25-0101, Effective from Jan 17, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001649, Expires on Aug 29, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/20/2023 | Act A25-0229 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 013762 | ||
Council | 10/13/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 10/11/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/05/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0229 | ||
Council | 09/26/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 11, 2023 | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/14/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0396 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 07/10/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |