Council | 11/03/2023 | Act A25-0269 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014462, Expires on Jan 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/26/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0269, Expires on Jan 24, 2024 | ||
Council | 10/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 31, 2023 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 09/28/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |