District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0496 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
1+1
42
53 1
4+ 2
5+________________________________ __________________________________ 3
6+Councilmember Anita Bonds Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 4
7+ 5
8+ 6
9+ 7
10+ 8
11+ 9
12+A BILL 10
13+ ___________ 11
14+ 12
15+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 13
16+_______________ 14
17+ 15
18+ 16
19+To amend, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, the Universal Paid Leave 17
20+Amendment Act of 2016 to prohibit private disability insurance providers from 18
21+reducing short-term disability benefits based on actual or estimated paid leave 19
22+benefits an eligible individual may be entitled to from the District, regardless of the 20
23+jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was issued or written; and to amend Title 21
24+I of the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of 2000 to 22
25+make offsetting or reducing benefits under a private market short-term disability 23
26+insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits received under the Universal 24
27+Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, enforceable under that law, regardless of the 25
28+jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was issued or written. 26
29+ 27
30+BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 28
31+act may be cited as the “Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Clarification 29
32+Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 30
33+ Sec. 2. Section 107(j)(1) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective 31
34+April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.07(j)(1)), is amended to read as 32
35+follows: 33
36+“(1) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible 34
37+individual under an individual or group policy for temporary or short-term disability insurance 35
38+based on estimated or actual benefits the eligible individual may or does receive under this act, 36
39+regardless of the jurisdiction in which such policy was issued, executed, written, or delivered.”. 37 2
640
7-AN ACT
41+Sec. 3. Section 120a of the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act 38
42+of 2000, effective November 13, 2021 (D.C. Law 24-45; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.20a), is 39
43+amended as follows: 40
44+(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows: 41
45+“(a) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible individual 42
46+under a temporary or short-term disability insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits 43
47+the eligible individual may or does receive under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 44
48+2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01 et seq.), 45
49+regardless of in which jurisdiction such policy was executed, written, or delivered.”. 46
50+(b) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows: 47
51+“(c) For the purposes of this section, the term: 48
52+ “(1) “Eligible individual” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 49
53+101(6) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 50
54+21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(6)). 51
55+ “(2) “Self-insured employer” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 52
56+101(19A) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. 53
57+Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(19A)).”. 54
58+Sec. 4. Applicability. 55
59+This act shall apply as of July 26, 2023. 56
60+Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 57
61+The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 58
62+statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 59
63+October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 60 3
864
9- ___________
10-
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-_______________
15-
16-
17-To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Universal Paid Leave
18-Amendment Act of 2016 to prohibit private disability insurance providers from
19-reducing short-term disability benefits based on actual or estimated paid leave
20-benefits to which an eligible individual may be entitled from the District, regardless
21-of the jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was issued or written; and to
22-amend Title I of the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act
23-of 2000 to make the prohibition on offsetting or reducing benefits under a private
24-market short-term disability insurance policy based on estimated or actual benefits
25-received under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 enforceable
26-under that law regardless of the jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was
27-issued or written.
28-
29-BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
30-act may be cited as the “Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Clarification
31-Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”.
32-
33- Sec. 2. Section 107(j)(1) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective
34-April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.07(j)(1)), is amended to read as
35-follows:
36-“(1) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible
37-individual under an individual or group policy for temporary or short-term disability insurance
38-based on estimated or actual benefits the eligible individual may or does receive under this act,
39-regardless of the jurisdiction in which such policy was issued, executed, written, or delivered.”.
40-
41-Sec. 3. Section 120a of the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act
42-of 2000, effective November 13, 2021 (D.C. Law 24-45; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.20a), is
43-amended as follows:
44-(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows:
45-“(a) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible individual
46-under a temporary or short-term disability insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-2
51-
52-the eligible individual may or does receive under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of
53-2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01 et seq.),
54-regardless of in which jurisdiction such policy was executed, written, or delivered.”.
55-(b) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows:
56-“(c) For the purposes of this section, the term:
57- “(1) “Eligible individual” shall have the same meaning as provided in section
58-101(6) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law
59-21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(6)).
60- “(2) “Self-insured employer” shall have the same meaning as provided in section
61-101(19A) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C.
62-Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(19A)).”.
63-
64-Sec. 4. Applicability.
65-This act shall apply as of July 26, 2023.
66-
67-Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.
68-The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact
69-statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved
70-October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).
71-
72-Sec. 6. Effective date.
73-This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
74-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
75-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
76-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
77-D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).
78-
79-
80-______________________________
81-Chairman
82-Council of the District of Columbia
83-
84-
85-
86-
87-_________________________________
88-Mayor
89-District of Columbia
90- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
91-
92-
93-
94-3
95-
96-
65+Sec. 6. Effective date. 61
66+This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 62
67+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 63
68+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 64
69+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 65
70+D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 66