District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0496 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/03/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
 ___________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Universal Paid Leave 
Amendment Act of 2016 to prohibit private disability insurance providers from 
reducing short-term disability benefits based on actual or estimated paid leave 
benefits to which an eligible individual may be entitled from the District, regardless 
of the jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was issued or written; and to 
amend Title I of the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act 
of 2000 to make the prohibition on offsetting or reducing benefits under a private 
market short-term disability insurance policy based on estimated or actual benefits 
received under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 enforceable 
under that law regardless of the jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was 
issued or written. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Clarification 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 107(j)(1) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective 
April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.07(j)(1)), is amended to read as 
follows: 
“(1) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible 
individual under an individual or group policy for temporary or short-term disability insurance 
based on estimated or actual benefits the eligible individual may or does receive under this act, 
regardless of the jurisdiction in which such policy was issued, executed, written, or delivered.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Section 120a of the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act 
of 2000, effective November 13, 2021 (D.C. Law 24-45; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.20a), is 
amended as follows: 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows: 
“(a) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible individual 
under a temporary or short-term disability insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
the eligible individual may or does receive under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 
2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01 et seq.), 
regardless of in which jurisdiction such policy was executed, written, or delivered.”. 
(b) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows: 
“(c) For the purposes of this section, the term: 
 “(1) “Eligible individual” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 
101(6) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 
21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(6)). 
 “(2) “Self-insured employer” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 
101(19A) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. 
Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(19A)).”. 
 
Sec. 4. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of July 26, 2023. 
 
Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 6. Effective date.  
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
3