Council | 03/15/2024 | Law L25-0137, Effective from Mar 02, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002689, Expires on Oct 13, 2024 | ||
Council | 12/04/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 12/01/2023 | Act A25-0317 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015478 | ||
Council | 11/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0317 | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/06/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0528 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 10/02/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |