7 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | ___________________ |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of |
---|
17 | | - | Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report |
---|
18 | | - | aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
21 | | - | act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Temporary Amendment |
---|
22 | | - | Act of 2023”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 1505 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of |
---|
25 | | - | Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official |
---|
26 | | - | Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows: |
---|
27 | | - | “(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall |
---|
28 | | - | submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes, in accordance |
---|
29 | | - | with existing law, aggregate data on the following with respect to the criminal justice and |
---|
30 | | - | juvenile justice systems: |
---|
31 | | - | “(A) Diversion; |
---|
32 | | - | “(B) Pretrial supervision; |
---|
33 | | - | “(C) Detention; |
---|
34 | | - | “(D) Prosecution; |
---|
35 | | - | “(E) Sentencing; |
---|
36 | | - | “(F) Commitment; |
---|
37 | | - | “(G) Incarceration; |
---|
38 | | - | “(H) Probation; |
---|
39 | | - | “(I) Parole; |
---|
40 | | - | “(J) Supervised release; and |
---|
41 | | - | “(K) Deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing agreements, |
---|
42 | | - | deferred disposition agreements, and consent decrees. |
---|
43 | | - | “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the |
---|
44 | | - | general public in interpretation of the data. |
---|
45 | | - | “(3) Prior to submitting and posting the aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide |
---|
46 | | - | each agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
| 7 | + | A BILL 1 |
---|
| 8 | + | 2 |
---|
| 9 | + | 25-528 3 |
---|
| 10 | + | 4 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 |
---|
| 12 | + | 6 |
---|
| 13 | + | _____________________ 7 |
---|
| 14 | + | 8 |
---|
| 15 | + | 9 |
---|
| 16 | + | To amend, on a temporary basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 10 |
---|
| 17 | + | Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report 11 |
---|
| 18 | + | aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs. 12 |
---|
| 19 | + | 13 |
---|
| 20 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBI A, That this 14 |
---|
| 21 | + | act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Temporary Amendment 15 |
---|
| 22 | + | Act of 2023”. 16 |
---|
| 23 | + | Sec. 2. Section 1501 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 17 |
---|
| 24 | + | Columbia Establishment Act of 2011, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 18 |
---|
| 25 | + | Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows: 19 |
---|
| 26 | + | “(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall 20 |
---|
| 27 | + | submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes the following 21 |
---|
| 28 | + | information, in accordance with existing law: Aggregate data on the following with respect to the 22 |
---|
| 29 | + | criminal justice and juvenile justice systems: diversion, pretrial supervision, detention, 23 |
---|
| 30 | + | prosecution, sentencing, commitment, incarceration, probation, parole, supervised release, 24 |
---|
| 31 | + | deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing agreements, deferred disposition 25 |
---|
| 32 | + | agreements, and consent decrees. 26 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|
52 | | - | and any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by the |
---|
53 | | - | agencies and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis |
---|
54 | | - | accordingly. |
---|
55 | | - | “(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly, |
---|
56 | | - | beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data: |
---|
57 | | - | “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and |
---|
58 | | - | “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward, |
---|
59 | | - | neighborhood, and police service area.”. |
---|
60 | | - | |
---|
61 | | - | Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, |
---|
62 | | - | enacted on October 5, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-229; 70 DCR 13762), is repealed. |
---|
63 | | - | |
---|
64 | | - | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
65 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
66 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
67 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
68 | | - | |
---|
69 | | - | Sec. 5. Effective date. |
---|
70 | | - | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by |
---|
71 | | - | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 60-day period of congressional review |
---|
72 | | - | as provided in section 602(c)(2) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December |
---|
73 | | - | 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(2)), and publication in the District of |
---|
74 | | - | Columbia Register. |
---|
75 | | - | (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. |
---|
76 | | - | |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
78 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | | - | Chairman |
---|
80 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
| 38 | + | “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the 27 |
---|
| 39 | + | general public in interpretation of the data. 28 |
---|
| 40 | + | “(3) Prior to submitting and posting aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide each 29 |
---|
| 41 | + | agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation and 30 |
---|
| 42 | + | any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by agencies 31 |
---|
| 43 | + | and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis accordingly. 32 |
---|
| 44 | + | “(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly, 33 |
---|
| 45 | + | beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data: 34 |
---|
| 46 | + | “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and 35 |
---|
| 47 | + | “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward, 36 |
---|
| 48 | + | neighborhood, and police service area.”. 37 |
---|
| 49 | + | Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, 38 |
---|
| 50 | + | passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-396), is repealed. 39 |
---|
| 51 | + | Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 40 |
---|
| 52 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 41 |
---|
| 53 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 42 |
---|
| 54 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 43 |
---|
| 55 | + | Sec. 5. Effective date. 44 |
---|
| 56 | + | (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 45 |
---|
| 57 | + | the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 60-day period of Congressional review 46 ENGROSSED ORIGINAL |
---|