District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0528 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 11/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
___________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2011 to clarify the requirement that the CJCC report 
aggregate programmatic data on process and outcomes of programs. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “CJCC Data Collection Technical Correction Temporary Amendment 
Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 1505 of the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District of 
Columbia Establishment Act of 2001, effective October 3, 2001 (D.C. Law 14-28; D.C. Official 
Code § 22-4234), is amended by adding new subsections (b-5) and (b-6) to read as follows: 
“(b-5)(1) By December 1, 2023, and on a quarterly basis thereafter, the CJCC shall 
submit to the Mayor and the Council and post on its website a report that includes, in accordance 
with existing law, aggregate data on the following with respect to the criminal justice and 
juvenile justice systems:  
“(A) Diversion; 
“(B) Pretrial supervision; 
“(C) Detention; 
“(D) Prosecution; 
“(E) Sentencing; 
“(F) Commitment; 
“(G) Incarceration;  
“(H) Probation; 
“(I) Parole; 
“(J) Supervised release; and 
“(K) Deferred prosecution agreements, deferred sentencing agreements, 
deferred disposition agreements, and consent decrees. 
 “(2) The CJCC shall include in the report information and context to aid the 
general public in interpretation of the data. 
“(3) Prior to submitting and posting the aggregate data, the CJCC shall provide 
each agency that supplies data at least one week to review and comment on the data presentation    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
and any analysis relevant to the agency. The CJCC shall review the feedback provided by the 
agencies and determine, in its sole discretion, whether to revise the presentation and analysis 
accordingly. 
“(b-6) The CJCC shall post the following year-to-date data on its website monthly, 
beginning with the earliest year for which CJCC is able to obtain historical data:  
 “(1) Arrests for violent crimes committed by juveniles and adults, by offense; and 
 “(2) Gun violence and homicide counts and rates citywide and by ward, 
neighborhood, and police service area.”.    
 
Sec. 3. Section 5 of the Prioritizing Public Safety Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, 
enacted on October 5, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-229; 70 DCR 13762), is repealed.  
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 60-day period of congressional review 
as provided in section 602(c)(2) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(2)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register. 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia